Our Governors
School Governors
Role of the Governing Board
The role of a governor is to contribute to the work of the Governing Board in ensuring high standards of achievement for all children.
The main responsibilities of a Governor
- As part of a team;
- The Setting the strategic direction of the school;
- Holding the leadership to account for the performance of the school;
- Making sure that resources are used well for the needs of the children.
The Governing Board is made up of:
- Co-opted Governors (appointed by the Directors)
- Parent Governors (elected by parents)
- Staff Governors (elected by staff)
Please find below details of how our Governing Board is structured, including the names, positions, responsibilities and terms of appointment for each Governor.
The Governors can be contacted at any time via a sealed envelope and delivered to Ms Y Wakefield, Leigh Trust, 104 Naseby Road, Alum Rock, Birmingham, B8 3HG
Code of Conduct for Local Governing BoardsGovernance Handbook on gov.uk
Meet the Governors (click + to expand)
Last updated 12th October 2023
Name |
Position |
Date of Appointment |
Term of Office |
Responsibility |
Appointed by |
Governance roles in other educational institutions |
Business and Financial interests |
Maria Nicholaou |
Chair
|
18.10.2021 | 4 years |
Attendance SEND Wellbeing |
Directors |
|
Works at Nansen Primary School |
Mrs Charlotte Nott |
Executive Head Teacher |
01.09.2015 |
|
Health & Safety |
|
|
|
Melissa Byrne
|
Staff Governor | 23.10.2023 | 4 years | Staff | TBC | ||
Emma Simpson | DHT Associate Governor (non-voting) | 01.09.2015 | |||||
Jane Cross
|
Co-opted |
18.07.2022 |
4 years |
EYFS |
Directors |
|
Related to Sean Cross (NPS Governor) |
Andy Beech | Vice Chair | 22.09.2022 | 4 years |
Compliance Curriculum Walk Thru's |
Directors | Works at Marlborough Primary School | |
Kamran Hussain
|
Co-opted | 14.02.2023 | 4 years | English Reading | Directors |
AHT St. Saviour's Primary Staff Governor |
|
Sandra Cable
|
Co-opted | 27.03.2023 | 4 years | Oracy | Directors | tbc | |
Katie Burke |
Co-opted | 17.07.2023 | 4 years | Maths | Directors | TBC | Works at Ulverley Primary School |
Fadwa Hakmi |
Parent Governor |
01.03.2022 |
4 years |
Safeguarding |
Parents |
|
None Declared |
Shabeena Ara | Parent Governor | 20.09.2022 | 4 years | Sports Premium & Pupil Premium | Parents | None Declared | |
Mrs Charlotte Taft |
Clerk |
|
|
Link to Governor training |
|
|
Attingham Education |
RESIGNATIONS WITHIN THE LAST 12 MONTHS |
|
Date Resigned/End of Term |
|
|
|
|
|
Robert Cummins | Co-opted | 01.09.2022 | |||||
Andrea Carter | Staff | 01.09.2022 | |||||
Sarahlou Barrow Lewis | Co-opted | 13.09.2022 | |||||
Luke Cooper | Co-opted | 25.11.2022 | |||||
Seamina Sultana | Staff | 13.10.2023 |
Attendance Records
Alston LGB Attendance to date
2023 - 2024 (click + to expand)
NAME
|
ATTENDANCE |
Charlotte Nott - Executive Head Teacher |
2/2 |
Seamina Sultana - Staff1/1 |
2/2 |
Andy Beech - Co-opted |
2/2 |
Jane Cross - Co-opted |
1/2 |
Maria Nicholaou - Co-opted |
1/2 |
Kamran Hussain - Co-opted |
1/2 |
Katie Burke - Co-opted |
1/2 |
Sandra Cable - Co-opted |
2/2 |
Fadwa Hakmi - Parent |
2/2 |
Shabeena Ara - Parent | 2/2 |
Emma Simspon - Associate | 2/2 |
2022 - 2023 (click + to expand)
NAME |
ATTENDANCES |
Charlotte Nott (Executive Head Teacher) |
4/4 |
Seamina Sultana (Staff Governor) |
4/4 |
Andy Beech - Vice Chair (Co-opted Governor) |
4/4 |
Jane Cross (Co-opted Governor) |
3/4 |
Maria Nicholaou - Chair (Co-opted Governor) |
3/4 |
Fadwa Hakmi (Parent Governor) |
4/4 |
Shabeen Ara (Parent Governor) |
4/4 |
Sandra Cable (Co-opted Governor) |
2/2 |
Kamran Hussain (Co-opted Governor) |
2/2 |
Click below for more information about Leigh Trust